Santafemia v. The City of New York
Plaintiff: Rocco Santafemia
Defendant: The City of New York
Case Number: 1:2018cv04750
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion to Adjourn Conference #9 is granted. The in person initial conference scheduled for 11/16/2018 is hereby adjourned to 12/11/2018 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet #8 and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 12/11/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/17/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Rocco Santafemia. (Shisha, Jacob)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will be held on 11/16/2018 at 10:30 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 11/16/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/25/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The City of New York. (Depugh, David)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for an extension of time to answer #6 is granted. Defendant has until September 28, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/21/2018. (Zhang, Fan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The City of New York. (Depugh, David)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Depugh on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Depugh, David)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Rocco Santafemia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shisha, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santafemia v. The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: David Lee Depugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocco Santafemia
Represented By: Jacob Shisha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?