Moore v. Polanco et al
Plaintiff: Joshua D Moore
Defendant: Pavel Polanco, Alastor G Polanco, Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc. and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv04981
Filed: September 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc.. (Misiti, Frank)
October 31, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Misiti, Frank)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Kessel on behalf of Alastor G Polanco, Pavel Polanco (aty to be noticed) (Kessel, Jon)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Michael Misiti on behalf of Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc., State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (aty to be noticed) (Misiti, Frank)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Troisi on behalf of Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc., State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (aty to be noticed) (Troisi, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc. and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 10/31/2018. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 11/15/2018 at 11:00 before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 11/8/2018. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference except in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/5/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc., State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Mulholland, Laura)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Jane Mulholland on behalf of Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc., State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (aty to be noticed) (Mulholland, Laura)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua D Moore. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Halperin, Steven)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua D Moore. Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Halperin, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc., Alastor G Polanco, Pavel Polanco, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc., Alastor G Polanco, Pavel Polanco, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10698682 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Joshua D Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Halperin, Steven) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/4/2018) (Davis, Kimberly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Polanco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavel Polanco
Represented By: Jon M. Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alastor G Polanco
Represented By: Jon M. Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Roth Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Jane Mulholland
Represented By: Michael A. Troisi
Represented By: Frank Michael Misiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Laura Jane Mulholland
Represented By: Michael A. Troisi
Represented By: Frank Michael Misiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua D Moore
Represented By: Steven T. Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?