J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Dowling et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc and J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Defendant: Eludz Lounge, LLC and Jordane Dowling
Case Number: 1:2018cv05086
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Jordane Dowling served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Eludz Lounge, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jordane Dowling, Eludz Lounge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly) .
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jordane Dowling, Eludz Lounge, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10713822 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Dowling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eludz Lounge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordane Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?