J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Samuels et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc and J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Defendant: Samuels Top Ranking, Inc. and George A Samuels
Case Number: 1:2018cv05090
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Jack B Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 . The previously scheduled Initial Conference is adjourned to 12/5/2018 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/8/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by George A Samuels, Samuels Top Ranking, Inc.. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING. Magistrate Judge Pollak is directed to treat this case under Local Rule 72.2 and is respectfully requested to expedite. Respectfully referred to the Magistrate Judge for expedition of discovery & settlement. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/18/2018. (Barrett, C)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 11/16/2018 @ 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/18/2018. (Caggiano, Diana)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Samuels Top Ranking, Inc. served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by George A Samuels, Samuels Top Ranking, Inc.. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. George A Samuels served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by George A Samuels, Samuels Top Ranking, Inc. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Wengrovsky on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Wengrovsky, Todd)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to George A Samuels, Samuels Top Ranking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons2) (Williams, Erica)
September 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George A Samuels, Samuels Top Ranking, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10714170 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Samuels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuels Top Ranking, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A Samuels
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?