Granata v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Anne Granata
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv05197
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mailloux on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (aty to be noticed) (Mailloux, Matthew)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-07696. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 14, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the defendant and the plaintiff, that the above-captioned case be, and hereby is, transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/14/2018) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Gura, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/4/2018) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John E. Gura, Jr on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Gura, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Albert Romano. The party information for the following parties has been modified: Anne Granata, Nancy A. Berryhill. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 24, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Albert Romano. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 24, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Romano, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nancy A. Berryhill, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Anne Granata. (Romano, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15488039)Document filed by Anne Granata.(Romano, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granata v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Granata
Represented By: Joseph Albert Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: John E. Gura, Jr.
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Matthew Mailloux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?