Nikolis v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Stamatios Nikolis
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv05581
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The application is granted on consent. Long Island Rail Road Company's time to answer, amend or supplement the answer or to make any motion with relation to the Complaint of Plaintiff be and the same hereby is extended through and including December 20, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/21/2018. (Guy, Alicia)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stamatios Nikolis. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Lauriello, Valerie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10780675 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Stamatios Nikolis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nikolis v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stamatios Nikolis
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?