McRae v. Delta Air Lines
Plaintiff: Linda McRae
Defendant: Delta Air Lines
Case Number: 1:2018cv05588
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Jack B Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Initial Conference Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/26/2018. (Williams, Erica)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, etc. served on Michael A. Cervini on 10/10/2018, filed by Delta Air Lines. (Maragoudakis, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Delta Air Lines (Martinez, Louis)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions including the ***CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page. (Williams, Erica)
October 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Delta Air Lines. (Martinez, Louis)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Maragoudakis on behalf of Delta Air Lines (aty to be noticed) (Maragoudakis, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines from Queens Supreme Court, case number 713794/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-10782081) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- New York Secretary of States Service of Process receipt, #2 Exhibit B- Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martinez, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRae v. Delta Air Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda McRae
Represented By: Michael Andrew Cervini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines
Represented By: Louis Robert Martinez
Represented By: Michael G. Maragoudakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?