Powers v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Curtney Powers
Defendant: City of New York, New York City Department of Correction, Correction Officer John Doe 1, Captain FNU Lacroix, Shield #1841, Correction Officer John Doe 2 and Captain FNU Alona
Case Number: 1:2018cv05593
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thais R. Ridgeway on behalf of New York City Department of Correction, City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Ridgeway, Thais)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the in person initial conference scheduled for 12/10/2018 is hereby adjourned to 2/8/2019 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the Discovery Plan Worksheet located in the original order and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 2/8/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/26/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time #8 is granted. Answers for all Defendants are due 12/7/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/1/2018. (Murphy, Colleen)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by New York City Department of Correction, City of New York. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will take place on 12/10/2018 at 10:30 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 12/10/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/18/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtney Powers. New York City Department of Correction served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Wilt, Devon)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtney Powers. City of New York served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Wilt, Devon)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York City Department of Correction, City of New York. (Attachments: #1 NYC Correction summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Correction, Captain FNU Alona, City of New York, Correction Officer John Doe 1, Correction Officer John Doe 2, Captain FNU Lacroix, Shield #1841 filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10782568 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Curtney Powers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - City, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons- DOC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilt, Devon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtney Powers
Represented By: Devon Marie Wilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Represented By: Andrew James Rauchberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Correction
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Represented By: Andrew James Rauchberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain FNU Lacroix, Shield #1841
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain FNU Alona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?