Wu v. Channing Daughters Winery LLC
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Defendant: Channing Daughters Winery LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05604
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent; the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 12, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/29/2018. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , with consent of Plaintiff, for up to and including December 12, 2018 by Channing Daughters Winery LLC. (Sverdlov, Samuel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Sverdlov on behalf of Channing Daughters Winery LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sverdlov, Samuel)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Channing Daughters Winery LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Channing Daughters Winery LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10786372 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Kathy Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Marks, Bradly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Channing Daughters Winery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channing Daughters Winery LLC
Represented By: Samuel Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?