Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Khotenok et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, P.T., Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., Svetlana Khotenok, Bayview Medical Care, P.C., Mark Mirvis, Urbain Richard, A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C., Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D., Grace Ragues Maisel, MD, Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, M.D., Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac., ABC Corporations 1 through 20, Roger Fils Jacques, M.D., Ahmed Medical Care, P.C., All Kind Physical Therapy P.C., M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C., Performance Plus Medical P.C. and John Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 1:2018cv05650
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Referring Judge: Jack B Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C.. (Nof, Eitan)
November 30, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Roger Fils Jacques, MD served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Mark Mirvis answer is due 12/28/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/29/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
November 29, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Solely as to Defendant Mark Mirvis by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 27, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, PT served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 27, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Svetlana Khotenok served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order AMENDED ORDER re #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., and JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., answers are due 12/28/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/15/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
November 15, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Joseph R Gambino, D.C. served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/28/2019. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Mark Mirvis served on 11/12/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Performance Plus Medical P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 12/28/2019. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Bayview Medical Care, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. All Kind Physical Therapy P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Ahmed Medical Care, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 12/28/2019. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Urbain Richard served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac. served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, MD served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., and JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., answers are due 12/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/9/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Solely as to Defendants Joseph Robert Gambino, D.C., Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., and JJ & R Chiropractic P.C. by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Pinzow, Lee)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Midgett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Midgett, Andrew)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eitan Nof on behalf of Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Nof, Eitan)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Court Order on Case Filing: Treat under Local Rule 72.2. SO Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/23/2018. (Ramesar, Thameera)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James A McKenney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (McKenney, James)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 1/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/26/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Stern on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Stern, Robert)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C., Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C., Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, MD, Ahmed Medical Care, P.C., Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D., All Kind Physical Therapy P.C., Bayview Medical Care, P.C., Joseph R Gambino, D.C., Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac., JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C., Roger Fils Jacques, MD, Svetlana Khotenok, M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C., Grace Ragues Maisel, MD, Mark Mirvis, Performance Plus Medical P.C., Urbain Richard, Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C., Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, PT. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 10, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10807717 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure, #4 Appendix, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D) (Pinzow, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Khotenok et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Hamed Anter Zidan, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Needle Acupuncture, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Gambino, D.C.
Represented By: Eitan Nof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Svetlana Khotenok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Medical Care, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Mirvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urbain Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.R.A. Medical Care, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Chiropractic & Wellness, P.C.
Represented By: Eitan Nof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ & R Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Eitan Nof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suhel Hussain Ahmed, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Ragues Maisel, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaikh Jauhar Ahmed, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawel Gierucki, L.Ac.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Fils Jacques, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Medical Care, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Kind Physical Therapy P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.H.Z. Physical Therapy P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Plus Medical P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Andrew Midgett
Represented By: James A McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Andrew Midgett
Represented By: James A McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Andrew Midgett
Represented By: James A McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee Pinzow
Represented By: Robert A. Stern
Represented By: Andrew Midgett
Represented By: James A McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?