Coleman v. Grand
Plaintiff: STEVEN DOUGLAS COLEMAN
Defendant: MARIA KIM GRAND
Case Number: 1:2018cv05663
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
2 Judge: Jack B Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Richman on behalf of Steven Douglas Coleman (aty to be noticed) (Richman, Steven)
March 26, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #107 Judgment, #106 Memorandum & Opinion, by Steven Douglas Coleman. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14316694. Appeal Record due by 4/9/2021. (Richman, Steven)
March 26, 2021 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #108 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean)
March 2, 2021 Filing 107 JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff on Plaintiffs libel claim; and in favor of Plaintiff Coleman on Defendants defamation counterclaim and on Defendants intentional infliction of emotional distress claim. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy on 3/2/2021. (Almonte, Giselle)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Both parties defamation claims and Grands IIEDcounterclaim fail as a matter of law, and the respective cross-motions of the parties are resolved correspondingly. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/22/2021. (Almonte, Giselle)
February 2, 2021 Filing 105 NOTICE by Maria Kim Grand of New Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-December 29, 2020 Memorandum Order) (McKnight, Katherine)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jack B. Weinstein recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano for all further proceedings. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 2/10/2020. (Marziliano, August)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER. In light of reassignment, all previously scheduled proceedings are cancelled. The Court will notify the parties via ECF as to future scheduling matters. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/12/2020. (Hermann, Jonathan)
February 3, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment , #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment : The Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2020 is adjourned to 2/20/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10B South before Judge Jack B. Weinstein. (Lowe, June)
January 28, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Change of Address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (White, A. Mackenna)
January 28, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment , #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment : The Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 is adjourned to 2/11/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10B South before Judge Jack B. Weinstein. (Lowe, June)
December 19, 2019 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Coleman, #2 Declaration of Joyce Cooper, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Cooper, Joyce)
December 19, 2019 Filing 101 REPLY in Support re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
December 12, 2019 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 16, 2019, before Judge Mann. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020. (Rocco, Christine)
December 12, 2019 Filing 99 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 17, 2019, before Judge Mann. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020. (Rocco, Christine)
December 12, 2019 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 24, 2019, before Judge Mann. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020. (Rocco, Christine)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Resetting Hearing as to #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment, #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The hearing will be held on 1/29/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1OB South. Any reply briefs shall be filed by 12/19/2019. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 12/4/2019. (Barrett, C)
November 22, 2019 Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Mackenna White) filed by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MariaKimGrand_PDFTran (Excerpts), #2 Exhibit B - Despite recognition, jazz sax player Steve Coleman finds respite in Allentown - The Morning Call, #3 Exhibit C - Jazz iconoclast Steve Coleman on the ancient bedrock of human creativity Artis, #4 Exhibit D - November 7 2009 Skype Messages, #5 Exhibit E - January 22 2010 Skype Messages - B, #6 Exhibit F - November 25 2009 Skype Messages, #7 Exhibit G - January 22 2010 Skype Messages - A, #8 Exhibit H - January 27 2012 Emails, #9 Exhibit I - January 9 2015 Email, #10 Exhibit J - August 1 2015 Text Messages, #11 Exhibit K - August 8 2015 Texts, #12 Exhibit L - August 13 2015 Text Messages, #13 Exhibit M - April 22 2018 Emails, #14 Exhibit N - January 2 2019 Emails, #15 Exhibit O - September 4 2015 Email, #16 Exhibit P - November 22 2015 Emails, #17 Exhibit Q - RobertGordonPhD_PDFTran Excerpts, #18 Exhibit R - June 12 2011 Email, #19 Exhibit S - February 4 2015 Emails, #20 Exhibit T - March 21 2016 Email, #21 Exhibit U - July 29 2014 Texts, #22 Exhibit V - 4-18-19 - Coleman - Coleman (Excerpts), #23 Exhibit W - November 20 2018 Email, #24 Exhibit X - October 2017 texts, #25 Exhibit Y - Steve and Sophia Texts, #26 Exhibit Z - November 15 2018 Emails) (White, A. Mackenna)
November 22, 2019 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Maria Kim Grand) filed by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
November 22, 2019 Filing 94 RESPONSE to Motion re #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Response to Plaintiff's 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts) filed by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
November 22, 2019 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
November 22, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement Response thereto, #2 Declaration of Steve Coleman, #3 Declaration of Joyce Cooper, #4 Exhibit Exs. A - L) (Cooper, Joyce)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. Any motion for summary judgment will be heard on 12/19/2019 at 10:30 a.m., in courtroom 1OB South. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/29/2019. (Barrett, C)
October 28, 2019 Filing 90 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibit H by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Corrected Exhibit H) (Cooper, Joyce)
October 28, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE by Steven Douglas Coleman re #88 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Exhibit F to Motion for Summary Judgment Withdraw (Cooper, Joyce)
October 28, 2019 Filing 88 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Exhibit F to Motion for Summary Judgment by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redacted Exhibit F) (Cooper, Joyce)
October 28, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's second motion, #90 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement, is granted, without objection. However, the Court notes that existing Exhibit H was docketed as entry #82-11. Plaintiff's first motion, #88 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement, has been withdrawn #89 and is terminated as moot. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/28/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
October 25, 2019 Motion terminated, docketed incorrectly: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum In Support filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. This document is not a motion but a memorandum in support. (Barrett, C)
October 24, 2019 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Grand Nov. 14, 2017 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Grand Nov. 14, 2017 email, #3 Exhibit C - Coleman May 5, 2018 Letter to We Have Voice at 1, #4 Exhibit D - Coleman May 16, 2016 text message, #5 Exhibit E - Coleman July 28, 2018 email, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff Resp. to Interrogatories_Redacted, #7 Exhibit G - Excerpts - 4-18-19 - Coleman - Coleman (212-213, 243, 255) + 4-26-19 - Coleman - Coleman (308-309, 407-114), #8 Exhibit H - Excerpts - 4-17-19 - Maria Kim Grand_PDFTran (43, 57, 77-80, 84-85, 120, 168), #9 Exhibit I - Coleman July 28, 2012 email, #10 Exhibit J - Coleman February 4, 2015 email, #11 Exhibit K - Grand Discovery Responses, #12 Exhibit L - Excerpts of Deposition of Sophia Wong, #13 Exhibit M - Wang May 5, 2018 email, #14 Exhibit N - Jan 12 2018 email Wong Exh 24_Redacted, #15 Exhibit O - Coleman May 28, 2018 email, #16 Exhibit P - WHO WE ARE WE HAVE VOICE, #17 Exhibit Q - Wang May 4, 2018 email, #18 Exhibit R - Wong Apr 21, 2108 email, #19 Exhibit S - The We Have Voice Collective Shuts Steve Coleman, #20 Exhibit T - Facebook May 8 We Have Voice Shuts Facebook Down, #21 Exhibit U - 1 Fn 53 IG IMG_7136, #22 Exhibit V - Plaintiff Initial Disclosures Coleman Dep Exhibit 10_Redacted, #23 Exhibit W - October 15, 2018 Email re Coleman Statement to Nancy Dillon (SColeman_0000024374_native), #24 Exhibit X - Oct 24 Steve Facebook Post_full Wong Dep. Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit Y - Coleman October 24, 2018 Twitter post, #26 Exhibit Z - Expert Rebuttal Report of Stephen A. Holzen, #27 Exhibit AA - Steve Coleman Wiki on Sexual Harassment, #28 Exhibit BB - Famed jazz saxophonist countersued by former protg who says he sexually harassed her - New York Daily News, #29 Exhibit CC - Expert Report of Dr. Robert M. Gordon, July 26, 2019, #30 Exhibit DD - Excerpts - 9-25-19 - Robert Gordon PhD_PDFTran (123-125), #31 Exhibit EE - Conversations - iChats with Control Numbers, #32 Exhibit FF - Wong October 26, 2018 text message, #33 Exhibit GG - Coleman June 23, 2018 text message, #34 Exhibit HH - Coleman May 18, 2018 email, #35 Exhibit II - Anthony Dean-Harris Nov. 7, 2018 email, #36 Exhibit JJ - Excerpt - 9-24-19 - Kristin Kucsma MA_PDFTran (168), #37 Exhibit KK - Daniel Wallace FB, #38 Exhibit LL - Savino Palumbo, #39 Exhibit MM - Julian Brezon Facebook post, #40 Exhibit NN - Michael Foster 2, #41 Exhibit OO - Wong November 14, 2018 text message, #42 Exhibit PP - Coleman May 23, 2018 text messages, #43 Exhibit QQ - Coleman February 13, 2018 text message, #44 Exhibit RR - Coleman November 15, 2018 email, #45 Exhibit SS - October 24, 2018 text messages between Plaintiff and Wong, #46 Exhibit TT - Coleman FB reply, #47 Exhibit UU - Steve FB response to Chris Forbes - do a little math, #48 Exhibit VV - Steve FB response to Sasha Berliner, #49 Exhibit WW - Steve Twitter) (White, A. Mackenna)
October 24, 2019 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Support re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
October 24, 2019 Filing 85 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
October 24, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
October 24, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum In Support by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
October 24, 2019 Filing 82 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement, #2 Declaration of Steve Coleman, #3 Declaration of Joyce Cooper, #4 Exhibit A to Cooper Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Cooper Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Cooper Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Cooper Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Cooper Decl., #9 Exhibit F to Cooper Decl., #10 Exhibit G to Cooper Decl., #11 Exhibit H to Cooper Decl., #12 Exhibit I to Cooper Decl., #13 Exhibit J to Cooper Decl., #14 Exhibit K to Cooper Decl.) (Cooper, Joyce) (Attachment 11 replaced on 10/28/2019) (Proujansky, Josh).
September 19, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michelle Owens Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11864236. by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Owens Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Verdict Sheet) (Lewis, Nicholas)
September 19, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/19/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara McGourty on behalf of Maria Kim Grand (aty to be noticed) (McGourty, Cara)
August 16, 2019 Filing 79 Minute Order for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/16/2019 regarding #75 defendant's motion to preclude plaintiff from offering testimony from his damages expert. The Court finds that plaintiff violated his discovery obligations but concludes that the drastic remedy of preclusion is not warranted. The Court orders plaintiff to produce, by August 23, 2019, the following documents: The complete 2013 and 2014 M-Base tax returns, including schedules, forms and attachments; for 2018 and 2019 (for which tax returns have not yet been filed), records reflecting income received by M-Base, as well as any financial transactions between M-Base and plaintiff, and documents evidencing loans and/or other transfers from M-Base to plaintiff, and/or repayments thereof, from 2013 to the present. The deadline for defendant to serve her expert report on damages is extended to September 6, 2019; the deadline for completion of expert depositions is extended to September 27, 2019. The briefing schedule set forth in DE #60-1 is extended by two weeks (i.e., with dispositive motions to be fully briefed, including opposition papers and replies, by December 6, 2019). See attached. (Proujansky, Josh)
August 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. (Proujansky, Josh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION to Withdraw 35.1 by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #78 Motion to Withdraw. As the referenced exhibit remains on Pacer under seal, without public access, removal of the exhibit -- which plaintiff "retains the right to use" -- would serve no apparent purpose. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/14/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
August 13, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 Letter MOTION for Discovery (to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony) filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Ex. to Declaration) (Cooper, Joyce)
August 12, 2019 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER. Re: DE #61 through DE #74, and DE #76. Discovery materials should not be routinely docketed into the court file. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/12/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
August 9, 2019 Filing 75 Letter MOTION for Discovery (to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony) by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mackenna White in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony, #2 Exhibit A to Mackenna White Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Mackenna White Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Mackenna White Declaration) (White, A. Mackenna)
August 9, 2019 ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: re #75 Letter MOTION for Discovery filed by Maria Kim Grand. Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion for a preclusion order and fees and costs (DE #75) is due by August 13, 2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/9/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman , AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena duces tecum served on Miles Okazaki on 06/06/2019, filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena duces tecum served on Vijay Iyer on 06/21/2019, filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena duces tecum served on James Francies on 05/23/2019, filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Linda Oh on 5/28/2019, filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena duces tecum served on Tivonn Pennicott on 05/31/2019, filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Jen Shyu on 06/14/2019, filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoenas served on Matthew Garrison on 06/06/2019, filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
August 1, 2019 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
July 17, 2019 Filing 60 Minute Order for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann: granting in limited part #57 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery Hearing held via Telephone Conference on 7/17/2019. See attached Minute Entry. (Kelson, Lise) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #1 Min. Ent.) (Kelson, Lise).
July 16, 2019 Filing 59 REPLY in Opposition re #58 Response in Opposition to Motion For Extension of time to complete Expert Discovery filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
July 16, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Experts filed by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails Dated July 12, 2019) (Bailen, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #57 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendant's response is due by July 16, 2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/15/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
July 12, 2019 Filing 57 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Experts by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cooper, Joyce)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying #52 Motion to Compel. The parties are directed to confer promptly regarding additional search terms plaintiff now proposes. Any further searches agreed to by the parties will be conducted at plaintiff's expense. The parties are reminded that fact discovery closes on June 28, 2019. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/21/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
June 20, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Change of Address (White, A. Mackenna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #52 Letter MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Dated April 10, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - Email Dated April 11, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - Transcript of April 26, 2019 Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - - Email Dated April 29, 2019, #5 Exhibit E - Email Dated May 10, 2019, #6 Exhibit F - Email Dated May 16, 2019, #7 Exhibit G - Letter Dated May 16, 2019, #8 Exhibit H - Email Dated May 17, 2019, #9 Exhibit I - Email Dated June 6, 2019, #10 Exhibit J - Email Dated June 13, 2019) (McKnight, Katherine)
June 18, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 Letter MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Maria Kim Grand. (McKnight, Katherine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 52 Letter MOTION to Compel Discovery by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Ex: A, #2 Ex: B) (Cooper, Joyce)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: defendant's response to #52 Letter MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Steven Douglas Coleman must be filed by June 18, 2019. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/14/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
June 6, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #51 Motion for Scheduling Order. The parties' proposed schedule is adopted. Initial expert disclosures must be served by July 12, 2019, rebuttal expert disclosures by July 26, 2019, and expert depositions completed by August 27, 2019. Dispositive motions must be filed by September 26, 2019, oppositions by October 25, 2019 and replies by November 8, 2019. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/6/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 51 Letter MOTION for Discovery Deadlines by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
May 30, 2019 Filing 50 Minute Order Re: #48 & #49 for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann held on 5/30/2019. As requested by defendant, the Court clarifies its 4/12/18 Protective Order and denies plaintiff's cross-motion for sanctions. See attached. Henceforth, the Court will not consider a request for judicial action that has not been docketed into ECF as a motion event. See attached Minute Entry. (Kelson, Lise)
May 29, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Steven Coleman by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
May 28, 2019 Filing 48 Letter Motion Seeking Clarification of the Protective Order entered by the Court on April 12, 2019 by Maria Kim Grand (White, A. Mackenna)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER. The parties are reminded that fact discovery closes on June 28, 2019. By June 7, 2019, counsel shall confer and file a joint letter-motion proposing a schedule for expert discovery (if any) and/or briefing and motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/10/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
May 9, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann: Settlement Conference held on 5/9/2019. Lengthy settlement discussions fail to resolve the case. See attached Minute Entry. (Kelson, Lise) Modified on 5/9/2019 (Main Document 47 replaced on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Bailen on behalf of Maria Kim Grand (aty to be noticed) (Bailen, Mark)
April 22, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to #25 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
April 19, 2019 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/19/2019. For the reasons discussed, next week's proceeding is adjourned sine die. See attached. (Proujansky, Josh)
April 15, 2019 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 12, 2019, before Judge Mann. Court Transcriber: Typewrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 518-581-8973. Email address: transcripts@typewp.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019. (Rocco, Christine)
April 12, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry and Order for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann granting in part and denying in part #30 Motion for Protective Order; denying #39 Motion to Strike. For the reasons stated on the record, while defendant may be questioned at her deposition about her sexual relationship with plaintiff, she may not be questioned about unrelated other sexual relationships. The Court denies defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's submissions (DE #39) but rules that the exhibits attached to plaintiff's declaration will remain under seal, for the reasons articulated by the Court. See attached for further discussion. (Proujansky, Josh)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: a telephone conference, to be initiated by defense counsel, will be held on April 12, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. re #30 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(c) filed by Maria Kim Grand. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/10/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
April 8, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 Letter MOTION to Strike #35 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #34 Response in Opposition to Motion (On an Emergency Basis) filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
April 8, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY in Support re #30 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(c) filed by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
April 8, 2019 Filing 39 Letter MOTION to Strike #35 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #34 Response in Opposition to Motion (On an Emergency Basis) by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emergency Motion to Seal) (McKnight, Katherine)
April 8, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #39 Letter MOTION to Strike #35 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #34 Response in Opposition to Motion (On an Emergency Basis) filed by Maria Kim Grand. The Court will provisionally restrict public access to docket entries 34 and 35, pending further court order. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/8/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
April 7, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by Steven Douglas Coleman re #37 Emergency MOTION to Seal 34.1, 34.2, 35, 35.1 HEREBY WITHDRAWN (Cooper, Joyce)
April 5, 2019 Filing 37 Emergency MOTION to Seal 34.1, 34.2, 35, 35.1 by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
April 5, 2019 Filing 36 Emergency MOTION to Seal Exs A - X (Document 35.1) by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
April 5, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(c) filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exs: A-X) (Cooper, Joyce)
April 5, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(c) filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ex: A, #2 Exhibit Ex: B,C,D) (Cooper, Joyce)
April 2, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #30 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(c) (Declaration of Maria Kim Grand) filed by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text to Maria re Performance on June 7, 2018, #2 Exhibit B - Text to Maria on July 4, 2018, #3 Exhibit C - Ookyung Lee Message to Maria, #4 Exhibit D - Maria Text to Sophia re Voicemail, #5 Exhibit E - John Zorn Email to Maria re Mediation, #6 Exhibit F - Letter dated 3/15/18 to Maria Grand) (McKnight, Katherine)
April 2, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #30 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(c) (Declaration of Katherine McKnight) filed by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mail from Katherine McKnight dated 9/11/18, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs First Interrogatories and Requests) (McKnight, Katherine)
April 2, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(c) filed by Maria Kim Grand. (McKnight, Katherine)
April 2, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to FRCP 26(c) by Maria Kim Grand. (McKnight, Katherine)
April 1, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Respect to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
April 1, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. In an order entered on March 29, 2019, plaintiff was directed to respond by today to defendant's request for leave to file a discovery motion exceeding three pages, DE #28. (Defendant's discovery motion, DE #28-1, not including attachments, is 14 double-spaced pages, or the equivalent of a 6 1/2-page single-spaced letter-brief.) Plaintiff's response to defendant's request to file an oversized motion focuses almost exclusively on the merits of the underlying discovery issues and then, without analysis, asks that the Court deny defendant's application for leave to file extra pages, or, in the alternative, schedule a discovery conference before the Court. See DE #29 at 2. If, as plaintiff observes, the issue is complex, see id., then the Court would be better served by a response from plaintiff that includes supporting authority. Defendant's motion to file her oversized submission (DE #28) is granted. Plaintiff's response to the discovery motion (which defendant shall promptly file as a stand-alone document) is due by April 5, 2019 (eight days after defendant first served plaintiff with her proposed submission), and may exceed the presumptive three-page limit. (Counsel are reminded that the Court's Individual Rules require that they provide Chambers with courtesy hard copies of any filing that exceeds 25 pages, including attachments). Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/1/2019. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/1/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 28 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Respect to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Motion for a Protective Order and Supporting Documents) (White, A. Mackenna)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER #27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application denied without prejudice, as the request for permission to file an oversized submission does not set forth whether opposing counsel consents or objects. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/29/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
March 29, 2019 ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: re #28 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Respect to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order filed by Maria Kim Grand. Plaintiff must respond to defendant's request to File Excess Pages by April 1, 2019. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/29/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
March 28, 2019 Filing 27 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Respect to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order by Maria Kim Grand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Motion for a Protective Order and Supporting Documents) (White, A. Mackenna)
March 27, 2019 Filing 26 Subpoena by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
March 27, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #26 : Discovery materials should not be routinely filed with the Court. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/27/2019. (Cardenas, Alex)
March 22, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Steven Douglas Coleman by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
March 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine McKnight on behalf of Maria Kim Grand (aty to be noticed) (McKnight, Katherine)
March 8, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Maria Kim Grand by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maria Kim Grand, filed by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Hearing; SCHEDULING ORDER: As this is not a consent case, the settlement conference will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge, on April 26, 2019 at 9:30 a.m.. Clients must appear in person in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/19/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
February 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Maria Kim Grand of Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (White, A. Mackenna)
February 7, 2019 Filing 20 Letter MOTION for Hearing /Settlement Conference (Joint) by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann: Initial Conference Hearing held on 1/24/2019. Fact discovery is to be completed by June 25, 2019. See attached Minute Entry. (Kelson, Lise) Modified on 1/28/2019, re: date hearing held (1/24/19)(Kelson, Lise).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER. For the following reasons, the court declines to approve the parties Consent Protective Order (docket entry #18) in its current form:Paragraph 3: The Court will not, in the abstract, designate[ ] as Confidential broad categories of documents; it is counsel for the parties who make such designations, in connection with those documents that counsel believe in good faith are entitled to protection.Paragraph 4(d): The Court is prepared to approve the limitations proposed by the parties with respect to depositions, but not with respect to trial or other court proceedings.Paragraph 5: When a party seeks to file confidential material with the court, it should be prepared to publicly file a copy of the submission that has been redacted to omit those portions that contain or disclose confidential material.Paragraph 7(b): This provision does not apply to the courts copies of confidential documents. Attachments: The referenced attachments have not been included in the document filed with the court. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/24/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Pretrial Order Discovery Protective Order by Steven Douglas Coleman (Cooper, Joyce)
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 First ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Miltenberg, Andrew)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting, on consent #16 Motion to Continue. The January 11th initial conference is adjourned to 1/24/2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 12/4/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 First MOTION to Continue by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Cooper, Joyce)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 1/11/2018 @ 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 13C South, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies for distribution of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/14/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Steven Douglas Coleman by Maria Kim Grand. (White, A. Mackenna)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Mackenna White on behalf of Maria Kim Grand (aty to be noticed) (White, A. Mackenna)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce Cooper on behalf of Steven Douglas Coleman (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Cooper, Joyce)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-10890895. by Steven Douglas Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Cooper, Joyce)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/31/2018. (Kelson, Lise)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Douglas Coleman. Maria Kim Grand served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Lewis, Nicholas)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING. Magistrate Judge Mann is directed to treat this case under Local Rule 72.2 and is respectfully requested to expedite. Respectfully referred to the Magistrate Judge for: expedite discovery & expedite settlement. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 10/18/2018. (Barrett, C)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Evan Lewis on behalf of Steven Douglas Coleman (aty to be noticed) (Lewis, Nicholas)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Maria Kim Grand. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Steven Douglas Coleman (Miltenberg, Andrew)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE :The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without an updated and completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to utilize the Civil Cover Sheet on our website and forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions ***INCLUDING THE CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY section on the second page***. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by STEVEN DOUGLAS COLEMAN (Miltenberg, Andrew)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE :The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a COMPLETED Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions *** INCLUDING the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) and THE CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY section on the second page***. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by STEVEN DOUGLAS COLEMAN (Miltenberg, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARIA KIM GRAND filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-10813282 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by STEVEN DOUGLAS COLEMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miltenberg, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Grand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN DOUGLAS COLEMAN
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Represented By: Nicholas Evan Lewis
Represented By: Joyce Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA KIM GRAND
Represented By: A. Mackenna White
Represented By: Katherine McKnight
Represented By: Cara McGourty
Represented By: Mark Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?