Kathy Wu v. Palmer Vineyards LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Defendant: Palmer Vineyards LLC, Palmer Vineyards, Inc, NORTHEAST FARMS LLC and PALMER WINERY, LTD
Case Number: 1:2018cv05671
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Order Dismissing Parties Palmer Vineyards LLC and Palmer Vineyards, Inc per #17 . So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/4/2018. (Carosella, Christy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS AGAINST Palmer Vineyards Inc and Palmer Vineyards LLC by Kathy Wu (Marks, Bradly)
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eunon J. Mizrahi on behalf of Palmer Vineyards LLC, Palmer Vineyards, Inc (notification declined or already on case) (Mizrahi, Eunon)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Levin-Epstein on behalf of Palmer Vineyards LLC, Palmer Vineyards, Inc (notification declined or already on case) (Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Levin-Epstein on behalf of Palmer Vineyards LLC, Palmer Vineyards, Inc (aty to be noticed) (Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eunon J. Mizrahi on behalf of Palmer Vineyards LLC, Palmer Vineyards, Inc (aty to be noticed) (Mizrahi, Eunon)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NORTHEAST FARMS LLC, PALMER WINERY, LTD. NORTHEAST FARMS LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; PALMER WINERY, LTD waiver sent on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Sverdlov, Samuel)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Sverdlov on behalf of NORTHEAST FARMS LLC, PALMER WINERY, LTD (aty to be noticed) (Sverdlov, Samuel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy Wu. Palmer Vineyards LLC served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Marks, Bradly)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy Wu. Palmer Vineyards, Inc served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Marks, Bradly)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED Summons Issued as to NORTHEAST FARMS LLC, PALMER WINERY, LTD. (Layne, Monique)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED against Palmer Vineyards LLC, Palmer Vineyards, Inc, PALMER WINERY, LTD, NORTHEAST FARMS LLC, filed by Kathy Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Marks, Bradly)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 (COURTESY COPY) of (Email)Letter dtd. 10/29/2018 from Kathy Le Morzellec to Pltff's counsel Bradly Marks, attaching the Asset purchase agreement and affidavit requested indicating defts. Palmer Vineyard LLC and Palmer Vineyards Inc. has no connection to the purchaser of the assets, and the action has been wrongly filed against defts as indicated. (Attachments: #1 ASSET PURCHASE AGREEMENT). Fwd. to chambers. (Layne, Monique)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Letter dtd. 10/29/2018 from Katherine LeMorzellec, President of defts. Palmer Vineyards LLC and Palmer Vineyards Inc, in response to the complaint and advising the above action should be dismissed as to defts. Palmer Vineyards, Inc. and Palmer Vineyards LLC as it has sold its domain, and sold its asset on April 27,2018, and is no longer associated with the website in question. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support). Fwd. to chambers. (Layne, Monique)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Palmer Vineyards LLC, Palmer Vineyards, Inc. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Palmer Vineyards LLC, Palmer Vineyards, Inc filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10815365 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Kathy Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Marks, Bradly) Modified on 10/15/2018 (Davis, Kimberly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathy Wu v. Palmer Vineyards LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Represented By: Bradly Gurion Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer Vineyards LLC
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Represented By: Eunon J. Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer Vineyards, Inc
Represented By: Joshua Levin-Epstein
Represented By: Eunon J. Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHEAST FARMS LLC
Represented By: Samuel Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMER WINERY, LTD
Represented By: Samuel Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?