Wagner v. Jamieson et al
Plaintiff: John Wagner
Defendant: Ean Holding, LLC, Sennheiser Electronic Corp. and Paul A Jamieson
Case Number: 1:2018cv05723
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Sennheiser Electronic Corp. by Ean Holding, LLC. (Karlya, Joseph)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 11/29/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 5/31/2019. On or before 5/31/2019, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. An in person Status Conference is set for 4/9/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 4/2/2019, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Plaintiff to make a demand by 1/31/2019. Defendant to respond within 2-3 weeks of demand. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/29/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/29/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. Richard Abend appearing for Plaintiff. Joseph Karlya, III, Kenneth Brown and Dominic Boone appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #3:39-4:00.) (Quinlan, Krista)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John Karlya, III on behalf of Ean Holding, LLC, Paul A Jamieson (aty to be noticed) (Karlya, Joseph)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Meneses on behalf of Sennheiser Electronic Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Meneses, Jason)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff's motion #5 to remand this matter to New York State Supreme Court is DENIED. On October 12, 2018, Defendant Sennheiser Electronic Corp. ("Sennheiser") removed this matter on the basis of complete diversity pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b). Defendant avers that there is complete diversity of citizenship between Plaintiff (a resident of Connecticut), Defendant Jamieson (a resident of Massachusetts), and Defendants Sennheiser and EAN Holding, LLC (Delaware corporations). Plaintiff does not challenge the complete diversity of citizenship of the parties. Instead, Plaintiff argues that (1) Defendant's removal was untimely because Defendants October 12, 2018 removal of this case occurred more than thirty days after Plaintiff served his complaint on Defendant on January 23, 2018; (2) the other defendants in this matter have not consented to removal; and (3) Defendant Sennheiser waived all jurisdictional defenses below. Plaintiff's arguments are unavailing. First, while 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(1) requires that a defendant remove an action within thirty days of service of a complaint, 1446(b)(3) creates an exception for those cases where the grounds for removal are not stated by the initial pleading. In such cases, a notice of removal may be filed within 30 days after a defendant is put on notice by a pleading or other filing that a case is removable. Plaintiffs January 22, 2018 pleading did not state an amount in controversy. On September 14, 2018, in response to a demand filed by Defendant Sennhesier, Plaintiff notified Defendants that he was seeking $2 million in damages. After being put on notice of an amount-in-controversy that satisfied the jurisdictional requirements of 1332(a), Defendant Sennheiser timely filed a notice of removal on October 12, 2018. Second, while it is true that the other defendants in this matter have not consented to removal, such consent is only required where a party removes on the basis of original and not diversity jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(2)(A). Third, while Defendant waived its jurisdictional defenses, including lack of jurisdiction due to improper service, it did not waive its right to remove this case to federal court. Put differently, simply because Defendant waived its right to challenge the New York State Supreme Court's jurisdiction, does not mean that the Defendant was barred from seeking to remove this matter to a different court that exercised concurrent jurisdiction. For these reasons, Plaintiff's motion to remand is DENIED. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 11/21/2018. (Valentin, Winnethka)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion seeking to Remand Case filed by Sennheiser Electronic Corp.. (Harris, Warren)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting consent #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference. At the request of the parties, the 11/7/2018 Initial Conference is rescheduled to 11/29/2018 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are reminded that any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/6/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by John Wagner. (Abend, Richard)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: On October 26, 2018, Plaintiff filed a letter #5 requesting that the Court remand this matter back to state court. Defendant is directed to file a letter, not to exceed three pages, responding to Plaintiff's letter motion, on or before November 16, 2018. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 11/02/2018. (Williams, Erica)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Scheduling Order by Sennheiser Electronic Corp. (Harris, Warren)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by John Wagner. (Abend, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 11/7/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 11/1/2018. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/17/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sennheiser Electronic Corp. from Kings, case number 501449/18. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-10830283) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Harris, Warren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Jamieson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ean Holding, LLC
Represented By: Joseph John Karlya, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sennheiser Electronic Corp.
Represented By: Warren T. Harris
Represented By: Jason Meneses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A Jamieson
Represented By: Joseph John Karlya, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wagner
Represented By: Richard H. Abend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?