Brooklyn Center for Psychotherapy, Inc. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Brooklyn Center for Psychotherapy, Inc.
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv05892
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Ann M Donnelly
1 Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann M. Donnelly:Pre-Motion Conference held on November 29, 2018. Daniel Tuczinski appeared for the plaintiff. Dan Kohane appeared for the defendant. Case called, discussions held. The defendant is to file its motion to dismiss the plaintiff's complaint by February 11, 2019. The plaintiff is to file its response by March 11, 2019. The defendant is to file its reply, if any, by March 25, 2019. (Court Reporter Victoria Torres-Butler.) (Alsarraf, Ali)
November 15, 2018 10 Letter in response to Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference on a motion to dismiss the Insured's Complaint by Brooklyn Center for Psychotherapy, Inc. (Sherrin, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference: The pre-motion conference on the defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss is set for Thursday, November 29, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 4G North. The plaintiff is to file a response to the defendant's letter motion for pre-motion conference #9 by Friday, November 16, 2018. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/9/2018. (Alsarraf, Ali)
November 1, 2018 9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kohane, Dan)
November 1, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brooklyn Center for Psychotherapy, Inc. (Sherrin, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Tuczinski on behalf of Brooklyn Center for Psychotherapy, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Tuczinski, Daniel)
November 1, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Sherrin on behalf of Brooklyn Center for Psychotherapy, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Sherrin, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Barnas on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Barnas, Brian)
October 23, 2018 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2018 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 22, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Kohane, Dan)
October 22, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company from Supreme; Kings County, case number 519982/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-10861117) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Underlying Summons & Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kohane, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooklyn Center for Psychotherapy, Inc. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooklyn Center for Psychotherapy, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Sherrin
Represented By: Daniel J. Tuczinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan David Kohane
Represented By: Brian D. Barnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?