Lane et al v. American Airlines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jesse Lane and Aubrey Lane
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06110
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Margo K Brodie
1 Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 in light of #8 . The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. The attorney shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/17/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 in light of #8 . The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. The attorney shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/17/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 in light of #8 . The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. The attorney shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/17/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 Letter dated 12/14/2018 from James Mcdonough to Magistrate Judge Pollak attaching documentation related to #2 , #3 and #4 Motions for Pro Hac Vice. The documents have been added and regenerated. (Marziliano, August)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Airlines, Inc. (Chan, Alice)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Chan on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Chan, Alice)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER temporarily denying #4 . The motion for admission pro hac vice fails to comply with Local Civil Rule 1.3(c)(1), which requires certificates of good standing for each of the states in which applicant is a member of the bar, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing. The applicant may correct this deficiency by attaching compliant documentation as an exhibit to a letter filed on ECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/2/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER temporarily denying #3 . The motion for admission pro hac vice fails to comply with Local Civil Rule 1.3(c)(1), which requires certificates of good standing for each of the states in which applicant is a member of the bar, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing. The applicant may correct this deficiency by attaching compliant documentation as an exhibit to a letter filed on ECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/2/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER temporarily denying #2 . The motion for admission pro hac vice fails to comply with Local Civil Rule 1.3(c)(1), which requires certificates of good standing for each of the states in which applicant is a member of the bar, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing. The applicant may correct this deficiency by attaching compliant documentation as an exhibit to a letter filed on ECF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/2/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 31, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 150, receipt number 4653133905 (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Margaret E. Foley) by Aubrey Lane, Jesse Lane. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #1 Certificates) (Marziliano, August).
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Chris Cowan) by Aubrey Lane, Jesse Lane. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #1 Certificates) (Marziliano, August).
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (James McDonough) by Aubrey Lane, Jesse Lane. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 11/1/2018 (Bowens, Priscilla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #1 Certificates) (Marziliano, August).
October 31, 2018 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653133902 (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Aubrey Lane, Jesse Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane et al v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Lane
Represented By: Margaret E. Foley
Represented By: James C. McDonough
Represented By: Chris Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Lane
Represented By: Margaret E. Foley
Represented By: James C. McDonough
Represented By: Chris Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?