Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. MLS Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: MLS Entertainment, LLC, Robert Gomes and Kenneth Persaud
Case Number: 1:2018cv06417
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' motion is not in compliance with Rule I(H) of the Court's Individual Rules, as it fails to indicate that defendants sought plaintiff's consent to the requested extension. Moreover, the motion does not make a showing of good cause for an extension of time, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Nonetheless, out of solicitude to pro se defendants Gomes and Persaud, the Court grants the motion. Gomes and Persaud shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before January 31, 2019. However, to the extent that the instant motion requests an extension of MLS Entertainment LLC's time to answer, the motion is denied because a limited liability company may appear in federal court only through licensed counsel. See Lattanzio v. COMTA, 481 F.3d 137, 140 (2d Cir. 2007). Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/28/2018. (Siegel, Max)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Gomes, Kenneth Persaud. (Galeano, Sonia)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Gomes, MLS Entertainment, LLC, Kenneth Persaud filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10928329 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons MLS Entertainment, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Robert Gomes, #4 Proposed Summons Kenneth Persaud) (Jekielek, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. MLS Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLS Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Persaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Damon Jekielek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?