McGill v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Frank McGill
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv06430
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Frank McGill. (Seelig, Richard)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall serve his motion on or before February 20, 2019; Defendant shall serve her response on or before March 25, 2019; Plaintiff shall serve his reply, if any, on or before April 15, 2019. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/3/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT (Social Security Appeal) (Attachments: #1 declaration of mailing) (Mailloux, Matthew)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant shall proceed promptly to obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and shall file the record by the date set forth below, unless an extension is granted by order of the Court for good cause. If Defendant is unable to file the record by that date, then the Court should be notified in writing by that date. Such notification should include a request for an extension, which specifies a date and demonstrates the good cause for the extension, including the date the administrative record was requested, whether or not it has been received, and the most recent efforts made to obtain it. Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint by December 21, 2018. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by January 21, 2019; Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by February 21, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by March 17, 2019. Memoranda in support of, or in opposition to, any motion filed in this matter, shall in all other respects comply with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Court's Individual Practices and Rules, including, but not limited to, page limitations. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/21/2018. (Brucella, Michelle)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mailloux on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (aty to be noticed) (Mailloux, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank McGill. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Seelig, Richard)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10928788 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Frank McGill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Seelig, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGill v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank McGill
Represented By: Richard Blake Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Matthew Mailloux
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?