Roache v. Long Island Rail Road et al
Plaintiff: Magwin Roache
Defendant: Michael Juchem, Charles Tator, Brotherhood of the Railway Signalmen Union Local 56, Sokolowski, Long Island Railroad, John Hanania, Christopher Natale, Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56 and James Sokolowski
Case Number: 1:2018cv06443
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James Orenstein
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. Re #6 Amended Complaint by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted. Defendants Long Island Rail Road and Mr. Michael Juchem shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by February 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/8/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael Juchem, Long Island Railroad. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56. (Galeano, Sonia)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. Re #6 Amended Complaint by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. Re #6 Amended Complaint by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
December 12, 2018 NOTICE re #8 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet -- The proposed summons at [8-5] submitted for Brotherhood of the Railway Signalmen Union Local 56 will not be issued at this time because that name does not correspond with the amended complaint. (Guy, Alicia)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Long Island Railroad, John Hanania, Michael Juchem, Christopher Natale, James Sokolowski, Charles Tator. (Attachments: #1 John Hanania, #2 Michael Juchem, #3 Christopher Natale, #4 James Sokolowski, #5 Charles Tator) (Guy, Alicia)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #6 Amended Complaint by Magwin Roache (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) (Hilferty, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Email, Firm name, telephone (Hilferty, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Magwin Roache. (Hilferty, Michael)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Magwin Roache (Hilferty, Michael)
November 15, 2018 NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Magwin Roache against Long Island Railroad, Brotherhood of the Railway Signalmen Union Local 56, John Hanania, Charles Tator, Michael Juchem, Christopher Natale, Sokolowski filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10930277 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Magwin Roache. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration) (Hilferty, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roache v. Long Island Rail Road et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Juchem
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Tator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of the Railway Signalmen Union Local 56
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sokolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hanania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Natale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of the Railroad Signalmen Local 56
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sokolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magwin Roache
Represented By: Michael P Hilferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?