Victor v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Monique Victor
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06463
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/16/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. (McCuiston, Hannah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #9 Scheduling Order,,,, of Service by American Airlines, Inc. (Chan, Alice)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held an initial conference in Plaintiffs pro se personal injury action on 12/14/2018. Plaintiff failed to appear. The Court shall hold another conference to give plaintiff one last chance to timely appear. The Court shall hold the conference on 1/16/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse. Plaintiff is warned that if she fails to timely appear at the 1/16/2019 conference. I shall recommend that this case should be dismissed pursuant to Rules 16(f) and 37(b)(2)(A)(v) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If Plaintiff cannot appear on 1/16/2019, she must contact Defendant's attorney to request an adjournment. Defendant's counsel shall serve a copy of this Order on the pro se Plaintiff via first class mail and file proof of such service on ECF forthwith. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 12/18/2018. C/mailed. (Initial Conference set for 1/16/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Initial Conference held on 12/14/2018. Recorded. Tick #(s) 11:43 - 11:49. No Appearance for pro se Plaintiff. Appearance for Defendant: Alice Chan, Esq. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court shall hold an initial conference in this case on 12/14/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse. No planning conference pursuant to Rule 26(a) shall be required at this time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 11/21/2018. C/mailed. (Initial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American Airlines, Inc.. (Chan, Alice)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2018 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal With Attachments served on Monique Victor, Pro Se Plaintiff on 11/13/2018, filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Chan, Alice)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by American Airlines, Inc. (Chan, Alice)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Airlines, Inc. from Supreme Court State of New York-County of Kings, case number 18-cv-2561. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-10933831) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summons With Notice) (Chan, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victor v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?