Hernandez v. United States Postal Service et al

Plaintiff: Junior Hernandez
Defendant: Amanda Ashley Hardy and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv06488
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sterling Johnson
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Junior Hernandez (Lavelle, Dominick)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amanda Ashley Hardy, United States Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, Notice (Other), Notice (Other), by Junior Hernandez (Lavelle, Dominick)
November 20, 2018 NOTICE :The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. Counsel is directed to forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions including the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page and a Proposed Summons. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10937419 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Junior Hernandez. (Lavelle, Dominick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Hernandez
Represented By: Dominick W. Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Ashley Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?