Marin v. Kenna
Plaintiff: Florica Marin
Defendant: Francis K. Kenna
Case Number: 1:2018cv06498
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. The action is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. A court dismissing a pro se complaint should grant leave to amend "at least once when a liberal reading of the complaint gives any indication that a valid claim might be stated." Chavis V. Chappius, 618 F.3d 162, 170 (2d Cir. 2010) (alterations and quotation marks omitted). Therefore, the Court grants the plaintiff leave to amend the complaint within 30 days of this Order being entered. If the plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, the amended complaint must either raise a question of federal law or present a claim between parties with complete diversity of citizenship. The amended complaint will replace the original complaint. It must be captioned "Amended Complaint," and must have the same docket number as this Memorandum and Order. If the plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within the time allowed or cure the deficiencies discussed herein, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment dismissing this action for the reasons set forth above. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 12/6/2018. (Greene, Donna)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Kerby on behalf of Francis K. Kenna (aty to be noticed) (Kerby, Shawn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Francis K. Kenna served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Ramesar, Thameera)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Copy of Summons Issued as to Francis K. Kenna. (Ramesar, Thameera)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-08762. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 28, 2018 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Florica Marin 22-26 Greene Ave Apt 1 Flushing, NY 11385. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: Accordingly, venue lies in the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)(2), and this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/28/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rj) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.[Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2018.] (Davis, Kimberly).
September 25, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2018.]
September 25, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Francis K. Kenna. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2018.] (Davis, Kimberly).
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Francis K. Kenna. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401218972)Document filed by Florica Marin.(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/15/2018.] (Davis, Kimberly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marin v. Kenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florica Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis K. Kenna
Represented By: Shawn Kerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?