Calandrino v. The Long Island Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Benedict Calandrino
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv06707
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Lois Bloom
1 Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court shall hold an initial conference in this case on February 7, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by January 31, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/15/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Long Island Railroad Company. (Muccigrosso, Andrew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels for The Long Island Railroad Company. (Muccigrosso, Andrew)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Long Island Railroad Company answer due 1/17/2019. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/18/2018) C/M (Galeano, Sonia)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, endorsed on doc.#5 . It is hereby Stipulated, that the time for Defendant The Long Island Railroad Company ("LIRR") to answer, amend or supplement the Answer or to make any motion with relation to the Complaint of Plaintiff be and the same hereby is extended through and including 1/17/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 12/18/2018. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Long Island Railroad Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10964441 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Benedict Calandrino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vogt, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calandrino v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benedict Calandrino
Represented By: Philip Patrick Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Andrew G. Muccigrosso
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?