Armapro Industries Inc. v. Rainbow Polybag Co.
Plaintiff: RAINBOW POLYBAG CO. and ARMAPRO INDUSTRIES INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06824
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 First ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Armapro Industries Inc. by Rainbow Polybag Co.. (Capetola, Anthony)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armapro Industries Inc.. Rainbow Polybag Co. served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Longobardi, Laura)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Armapro Industries Inc.. Rainbow Polybag Co. served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Longobardi, Laura)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rainbow Polybag Co. (Ramesar, Thameera)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Armapro Industries Inc. (McCabe, Monica)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Petraglia McCabe on behalf of Armapro Industries Inc. (aty to be noticed) (McCabe, Monica)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RAINBOW POLYBAG CO. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10984304 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by ARMAPRO INDUSTRIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conditions of Sale, #2 Exhibit B - email requests, #3 Exhibit C - purchase orders, #4 Exhibit D - demand with statement of account, #5 Exhibit E - purchase orders, #6 Exhibit F - demand with statement of account, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Longobardi, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armapro Industries Inc. v. Rainbow Polybag Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAINBOW POLYBAG CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMAPRO INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: Laura E. Longobardi
Represented By: Monica Petraglia McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?