Summer v. Seiko Epson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Steven Summer
Defendant: Seiko Epson Corporation and Epson America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06837
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application #24 dated 3/19/19, with the consent of plaintiff's counsel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The pre-motion conference scheduled for May 8, 2019 is adjourned to May 17, 2019 at 11:00 A.M. The Court is not available on the dates requested by counsel. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/19/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 24 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Brannon, Leah)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's letter application #17 dated 2/19/19 is GRANTED. A pre motion conference is scheduled for May 8, 2019 @ 11AM. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this conference and then file a letter application requesting an adjournment. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/8/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 22 Letter in response to Defendants' letter re pre-motion conference by Steven Summer (Avery, Patricia)
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 Letter for Seiko Epson re Waiver of Service and Joining by Seiko Epson Corporation (Brannon, Leah)
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Brannon on behalf of Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Brannon, Leah)
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Kaiser on behalf of Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Kaiser, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER: As to Voluntary Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Second and Third Causes of Action. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/20/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Epson America, Inc.. (Brannon, Leah)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order on Voluntary Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Second and Third Causes of Action by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation (Brannon, Leah)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Zaroogian on behalf of Steven Summer (aty to be noticed) (Zaroogian, Sean)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Insley-Pruitt on behalf of Steven Summer (aty to be noticed) (Insley-Pruitt, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Steven J. Kaiser Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/23/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leah Brannon Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/23/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11126550. by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Kaiser, Steven)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11126465. by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Brannon, Leah)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.; granting #11 Motion for All Defendants Extension of Time to Answer by 2/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/11/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Correction of Letter Motion Filed 1/9/2019 by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Dassin, Lev)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION #7 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by Clerk of Court on 1/10/2019. (Marziliano, August)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Dassin, Lev)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lev L. Dassin on behalf of Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Dassin, Lev)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Steven Summer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Avery, Patricia)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Summer. Seiko Epson Corporation served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (Avery, Patricia)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Summer. Epson America, Inc. served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Avery, Patricia)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10985144 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Steven Summer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Avery, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summer v. Seiko Epson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seiko Epson Corporation
Represented By: Lev L. Dassin
Represented By: Steven J. Kaiser
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson America, Inc.
Represented By: Lev L. Dassin
Represented By: Steven J. Kaiser
Represented By: Leah Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Summer
Represented By: Patricia I. Avery
Represented By: Matthew Insley-Pruitt
Represented By: Sean Michael Zaroogian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?