Crosson v. Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc.

Plaintiff: Aretha Crosson
Defendant: Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06983
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: I Leo Glasser
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a response to the complaint from 1/28 to 2/28/2019. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 1/25/2019. (Kessler, Stanley)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc.. (Schwarz, Douglas)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/28/2019 to File a response to the complaint. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 1/3/2019. (Kessler, Stanley)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc.. (Schwarz, Douglas)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 11, 2018 Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11003570 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Aretha Crosson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shaked, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosson v. Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aretha Crosson
Represented By: Dan Shaked
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie May Confections Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas T. Schwarz
Represented By: Michael Friel Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?