Vigilant Marine Services, Inc. v. Sea Tow Services International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vigliant Marine Services, Inc. D/B/A Sea Tow Services Ri and Vigilant Marine Services, Inc.
Defendant: Joseph J. Frohnhoefer III, Sea Tow Services International, Inc and Ramsey Chason
Case Number: 1:2018cv07297
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
1 Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Contract:Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by All Defendants. (Stein, Mitchell)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 ICQuestionnaire/Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ramsey Chason's answer is due on 2/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/18/2019. (Marino, Janine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Vigilant Marine Services, Inc. Notice of Consent for Extension of Time to Serve Answer (McKessy, Scott) Modified, changed to motion on 1/18/2019 (Marino, Janine).
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vigilant Marine Services, Inc.. Ramsey Chason served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (McKessy, Scott)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vigilant Marine Services, Inc.. Joseph J. Frohnhoefer III served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (McKessy, Scott)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vigilant Marine Services, Inc.. Sea Tow Services International, Inc served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (McKessy, Scott)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION #2 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 1/2/2019. (Marziliano, August)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Vigliant Marine Services, Inc. D/B/A Sea Tow Services Ri. (McKessy, Scott)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11050090 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Vigliant Marine Services, Inc. D/B/A Sea Tow Services Ri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Sea Tow Services International, Inc, #3 Proposed Summons Joseph J. Frohnhoefer, III, #4 Proposed Summons Ramsey Chason, c/o 1230 MA-28A, #5 Proposed Summons Ramsey Chason, c/o 15 Seneca Lane) (McKessy, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigilant Marine Services, Inc. v. Sea Tow Services International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Frohnhoefer III
Represented By: Mitchell A. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Tow Services International, Inc
Represented By: Mitchell A. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey Chason
Represented By: Mitchell A. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vigliant Marine Services, Inc. D/B/A Sea Tow Services Ri
Represented By: Scott S. McKessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vigilant Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Scott S. McKessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?