Khotovitskaya v. Shimunov et al
Plaintiff: Elena Khotovitskaya
Defendant: David Shimunov and Albert Shimunov
Case Number: 1:2018cv07303
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elena Khotovitskaya. David Shimunov served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Nossel, Deon)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 3/13/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/13/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elena Khotovitskaya. Albert Shimunov served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Nossel, Deon)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Albert summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albert Shimunov, David Shimunov filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11051212 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Elena Khotovitskaya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Albert Shimunov, #3 Proposed Summons David Shimunov) (Nossel, Deon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khotovitskaya v. Shimunov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shimunov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Shimunov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Khotovitskaya
Represented By: Deon Joshua Nossel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?