Piccione v. Maimonides Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Maureen Piccione
Defendant: Maimonides Medical Center and Rita Kogan
Case Number: 1:2018cv07371
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Piccione. Maimonides Medical Center served on 2/5/2018, answer due 2/26/2018. (Famighetti, Peter)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Piccione. Rita Kogan served on 2/5/2018, answer due 2/26/2018. (Famighetti, Peter)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Replaces & Corrects the Amended Complaint filed 1/11/19 (DE 10) against All Defendants, filed by Maureen Piccione. (Famighetti, Peter)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maureen Piccione, Rita Kogan, filed by Maureen Piccione. (Famighetti, Peter)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION #8 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 1/3/2019. (Marziliano, August)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Maureen Piccione. (Attachments: #1 Electronic filing receipt) (Famighetti, Peter)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Maureen Piccione (Famighetti, Peter)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Maureen Piccione (Famighetti, Peter)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Maureen Piccione (Famighetti, Peter)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Kogan summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rita Kogan, Maimonides Medical Center filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11056105 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Maureen Piccione. (Famighetti, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piccione v. Maimonides Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maimonides Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Kogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Piccione
Represented By: Peter J. Famighetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?