Poltorak v. Nissan Shapiro Law P.C.

Plaintiff: Poltorak Elie and Elie Poltorak
Defendant: Nissan Shapiro Law P.C.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07386
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: William F Kuntz
1 Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Letter MOTION to Dismiss and to Defendant's belated request fora pre-motion conference filed by Elie Poltorak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email to Defendant Dated January 28, 2019, #2 Exhibit B - Collection Letter Dated October 10, 2018) (Lynch, Eugene)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: March 21, 2019. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: April 22, 2019. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: May 22, 2019. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: June 21, 2019. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): July 9, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: July 23, 2019. Joint pretrial order due by: August 20, 2019. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/19/2019. (Guy, Alicia)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER -- I will not require an initial discovery planning conference in this case, and the parties are not required to meet and confer in accordance with Rule 26(f). Instead, I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that contemplates the completion of all discovery within four months. If there is an objection to the court's schedule, any party may either: (1) upon a showing of good cause and with the other party's consent, submit a proposed discovery plan in the form of the attached questionnaire; or (2) submit a letter request for an in-court conference that also sets forth the grounds for a different schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Questionnaire) (Guy, Alicia)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Pre-Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 at 12:30 P.M. in Courtroom 6H North before the Honorable William F. Kuntz, II. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/12/2019. (Douglas, Maura)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION to Dismiss by Nissan Shapiro Law P.C.. (Sasson, Alan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elie Poltorak. Nissan Shapiro Law P.C. served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Huebner, Levi)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nissan Shapiro Law P.C.. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Poltorak Elie (Lynch, Eugene)
January 2, 2019 NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Shapiro Law P.C. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11057627 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Poltorak Elie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lynch, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poltorak v. Nissan Shapiro Law P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Shapiro Law P.C.
Represented By: Alan J Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poltorak Elie
Represented By: Eugene Michael Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elie Poltorak
Represented By: Eugene Michael Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?