Vicedomini v. A.A. Luxury Limo Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Vicedomini
Defendant: Albert Acevedo and A.A. Luxury Limo Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv07467
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Certificate of Default by Steven Vicedomini (Attachments: #1 Supporting Declaration, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default, #3 Proof of Service) (Hassan, Abdul)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: A review of the docket sheet in this case reveals that the Complaint was served on January 7, 2019 and January 17, 2019, respectively, and no Answer has been filed or further action taken in the case. Plaintiff is now directed to show cause, in writing, by March 5, 2019, why the case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Failure to comply with this Order shall result in a recommendation that the case be dismissed with prejudice. See attached. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/26/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Vicedomini. Albert Acevedo served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Hassan, Abdul)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Vicedomini. A.A. Luxury Limo Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Hassan, Abdul)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 31, 2018 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.A. Luxury Limo Inc., Albert Acevedo filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11063198 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Steven Vicedomini. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hassan, Abdul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vicedomini v. A.A. Luxury Limo Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Vicedomini
Represented By: Abdul Karim Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.A. Luxury Limo Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?