N.M. v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: N.M.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv00079
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven Tiscione
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer City of New York answer due 3/26/2019; New York City Department of Education answer due 3/26/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/24/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of New York, New York City Department of Education. (Denterlein, Priscilla)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Priscilla Denterlein on behalf of City of New York, New York City Department of Education (aty to be noticed) (Denterlein, Priscilla)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N.M.. City of New York served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019; New York City Department of Education served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Hartley, Erika)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, New York City Department of Education Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by N.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 4, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653135757 (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.M. v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.
Represented By: Erika Louise Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Priscilla Denterlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Priscilla Denterlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?