Caldwell v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Julie Caldwell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00222
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall serve upon the plaintiff the administrative record of the proceedings, along with its answer, within 90 days of January 25, 2019, the date appropriations resumed for the federal government. Defendant shall move for judgment on the pleadings by service of motion papers upon plaintiff within 60 days of service of the administrative record upon the plaintiff. Plaintiff's response papers shall be served upon defendant within 60 days thereafter. Within 21 days of service of plaintiff's response (that is, by September 13, 2019), defendant shall serve its reply on plaintiff, and will also file the entire set of motion papers, stipulations of fact, and the administrative record with the court. The court respectfully reminds parties that pursuant to chambers practice concerning stipulations of fact for social security motions, see Individual Chambers Practices Section IV(C)(5), https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/rules/KAM-MLR.pdf, the parties shall confer and prepare a stipulation of facts with a chronology of medical treatment, to be filed on ECF on the date that the fully-briefed motions are due. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 2/4/2019. (Mazzurco, Vincent)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11096350 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Julie Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Osborn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Caldwell
Represented By: Daniel Adam Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?