Huang v. Whitestone Hospitality et al

Plaintiff: Xiao-Hui Huang
Defendant: Brooklyn Comfort Inn, Saanya Hospitality LLC, Maxi Ahmed, Whitestone Hospitality and Zihid Mubarek
Case Number: 1:2019cv00225
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Lois Bloom
1 Judge: Nina Gershon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order of Remand to Supreme Court of the State of New York, Kings County, case number 523694/2018. Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 2/14/2019. Certified copy mailed to Clerk of Supreme Court of the State of New York, Kings County. (Barrett, C)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Consent to Remand by Xiao-Hui Huang (Alatsas, Theodore)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court held the initial conference in this matter on February 8, 2019. The parties stated on the record that there is no basis for federal jurisdiction in this action. Therefore, the parties shall file a joint stipulation remanding the case to state court by February 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/11/2019. (Downs, Abigail)
February 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Initial Conference Hearing held on 2/8/2019 (FTR Log #2:12 - 2:21.) (Downs, Abigail)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Byrnes, John)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Xiao-Hui Huang (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Alatsas, Theodore)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Maxi Ahmed, Brooklyn Comfort Inn, Zihid Mubarek, Saanya Hospitality LLC, Whitestone Hospitality. (Gorman, Elizabeth)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maxi Ahmed, Brooklyn Comfort Inn, Zihid Mubarek, Saanya Hospitality LLC, Whitestone Hospitality (Gorman, Elizabeth)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants' counsel removed this employment discrimination action from Kings County Supreme Court on January 11, 2019. ECF No. #1 . Defendants' answer is due on January 18, 2019. Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2)(C). Any party seeking a jury trial shall make a demand by January 30, 2019. Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3)(A). The Court shall hold an initial conference on February 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by February 1, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference.Plaintiff alleges that defendants subjected her to gender discrimination, specifically sexual harassment, and a hostile work environment. Plaintiff also alleges that she was terminated in retaliation for her complaints of discrimination. However, plaintiff's complaint does not reflect that she pursued her discrimination claim by filing an administrative charge with either the New York State Division of Human Rights or the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. As filing a charge of discrimination is a condition precedent to filing an employment discrimination action, plaintiff shall be prepared to address the status of any administrative charge at the February 8, 2019 initial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/16/2019. (Panjini, Madhura)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maxi Ahmed, Brooklyn Comfort Inn, Zihid Mubarek, Saanya Hospitality LLC D/B/A Brooklyn Comfort Inn, Whitestone Hospitality d/b/a Brooklyn Comfort Inn from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 523694/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11097345) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavits of Service) (Byrnes, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Whitestone Hospitality et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooklyn Comfort Inn
Represented By: John Joseph Byrnes
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saanya Hospitality LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Byrnes
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxi Ahmed
Represented By: John Joseph Byrnes
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitestone Hospitality
Represented By: John Joseph Byrnes
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zihid Mubarek
Represented By: John Joseph Byrnes
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiao-Hui Huang
Represented By: Theodore Alatsas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?