Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. M S B Rx Corp. et al

Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Taira Rx Corp., Irina Hakimi, KZ Pharmacy Inc., Jordan Sudberg, M.D., Michael Slava Bassanell, Mani Ushyarov, D.O., M S B Rx Corp., John Doe Nos. "1" Through "5" and Mikhail Borukhov
Case Number: 1:2019cv00232
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
0 Judge: Nina Gershon
1 Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 22 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint,, regarding proposed motion to dismiss by Mani Ushyarov, D.O.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint,, by Michael Slava Bassanell, Mikhail Borukhov, Irina Hakimi, KZ Pharmacy Inc., M S B Rx Corp., Taira Rx Corp.. (Harfenist, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to the Honorable Nina Gershon from Adam L. Browser, Esq. dated March 5, 2019 requesting a pre-motion conference by Jordan Sudberg, MD. (Browser, Adam)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Mani Ushyarov, D.O. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to March 5, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/27/2019. (Besingi, Pembe)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Mani Ushyarov, D.O.. (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Mani Ushyarov, D.O. (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendants Michael Slava Bassanell, Mikhail Borukhov, Irina Hakimi, KZ Pharmacy Inc., M S B Rx Corp., and Taira Rx Corp., to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to March 5, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/25/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, on consent to March 5, 2019 by Michael Slava Bassanell, Mikhail Borukhov, Irina Hakimi, KZ Pharmacy Inc., M S B Rx Corp., Taira Rx Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Torczyner, Neil)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil S. Torczyner on behalf of Michael Slava Bassanell, Mikhail Borukhov, Irina Hakimi, KZ Pharmacy Inc., M S B Rx Corp., Taira Rx Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Torczyner, Neil)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant Jordan Sudberg, MD., to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to March 5, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/13/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Jordan Sudberg, MD. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order extending time for Defendant Jordan Sudberg, M.D. to Answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint) (Browser, Adam)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Mani Ushyarov, D.O. served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Smith, Joshua)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Michael Slava Bassanell, Mikhail Borukhov, Irina Hakimi, KZ Pharmacy Inc., MSB RX Corp. d/b/a Forest Drugs, and Taira Rx Corp. d/b/a Forest Drugs to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to February 25, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 2/7/2019. (Besingi, Pembe)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Tsirelman on behalf of Mani Ushyarov, D.O. (aty to be noticed) (Tsirelman, Gary)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Michael Slava Bassanell, Mikhail Borukhov, Irina Hakimi, KZ Pharmacy Inc., M S B Rx Corp., Taira Rx Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation) (Harfenist, Steven)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Nadjari on behalf of Jordan Sudberg, MD (aty to be noticed) (Nadjari, Douglas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L. Browser on behalf of Jordan Sudberg, MD (aty to be noticed) (Browser, Adam)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Elise Della Ragione on behalf of Jordan Sudberg, MD (aty to be noticed) (Della Ragione, Nicole)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Smith on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Joshua)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Harfenist on behalf of Michael Slava Bassanell, Mikhail Borukhov, Irina Hakimi, KZ Pharmacy Inc., M S B Rx Corp., Taira Rx Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Harfenist, Steven)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Slava Bassanell, Mikhail Borukhov, Irina Hakimi, John Doe Nos. "1" Through "5", KZ Pharmacy Inc., M S B Rx Corp., Jordan Sudberg, MD, Taira Rx Corp., Mani Ushyarov, D.O. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11098062 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - NO,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (Sirignano, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. M S B Rx Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taira Rx Corp.
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irina Hakimi
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KZ Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Sudberg, M.D.
Represented By: Douglas M. Nadjari
Represented By: Nicole Elise Della Ragione
Represented By: Adam L. Browser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Slava Bassanell
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mani Ushyarov, D.O.
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Represented By: Gary Tsirelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M S B Rx Corp.
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Nos. "1" Through "5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Borukhov
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?