State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Lavelle Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company a/s/o Jared Tardell and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Lavelle Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00426
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: March 5, 2019. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: March 19, 2019. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: April 12, 2019. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): May 17, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: July 31, 2019. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by: August 20, 2019. Defendant's expert disclosures due by: September 26, 2019. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: October 11, 2019. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): October 22, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/5/2019. (Orenstein, James)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 3/5/2019. Scheduling: (1) The next status conference will be held on May 17, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on October 22, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Summary: The plaintiff has no procedural objection to the removal of the case to this court. I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Protective Order -- The stipulation and order of confidentiality, docket entry #9 , is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/5/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Protective Order on Consent by Lavelle Industries, Inc.. (DeSantis, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order Initial Conference Questionnaire/Joint Discovery Plan by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Markowitz, Stuart)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Lavelle Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Strongin, Howard)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, March 5, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than March 1, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/1/2019. (Guy, Alicia)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #3 Stipulation -- The stipulation is so ordered; the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 1, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/28/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Answer by Lavelle Industries, Inc. (DeSantis, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard F. Strongin on behalf of Lavelle Industries, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Strongin, Howard)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lavelle Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11125139) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Jury Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (DeSantis, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Lavelle Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavelle Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Howard F. Strongin
Represented By: Michael J. DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company a/s/o Jared Tardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Stuart D. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?