Brito v. Marina's Bakery Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Jose Brito
Defendant: Sergio Gonzalez, Margarito Gonzalez and Marina's Bakery Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00828
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 4/10/2019. Appearance for Plaintiff: Innessa Melamed Huot \ Jeffrey Olshansky \ Sumantra T. Sinha. Appearance for Defendant: Diane Klein (no notice of appearance filed counsel was advised to file one by the end of the day). By 4/17/2019, parties to submit a joint letter indicating: (1) if defendant consents to collective certification and dates for proposed notice; (2) if defendant does not consent, dates for response to motion and reply. Discovery regarding individual plaintiff to proceed. Document requests and interrogatores due 5/13/2019 - responses 6/14/2019. Telephone Conference set for 6/20/2019 @ 10:30 AM. (Caggiano, Diana)
April 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh G. Jasne on behalf of Margarito Gonzalez, Sergio Gonzalez, Marina's Bakery Corp. (notification declined or already on case) (Jasne, Hugh)
April 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Farrell Austin Brody on behalf of Jose Brito (aty to be noticed) (Brody, Farrell)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action by Jose Brito. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Innessa M. Huot, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Proposed Order, #15 Certificate of Service) (Huot, Innessa)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Huot, Innessa)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/10/2019 @ 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/12/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Margarito Gonzalez, Sergio Gonzalez, Marina's Bakery Corp. re #12 Answer to Complaint, #13 Notice of Appearance (Jasne, Hugh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh G. Jasne on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Jasne, Hugh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Jasne, Hugh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Brito. Sergio Gonzalez served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Huot, Innessa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Brito. Margarito Gonzalez served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Huot, Innessa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Brito. Marina's Bakery Corp. served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Huot, Innessa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Olshansky on behalf of Jose Brito (aty to be noticed) (Olshansky, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sumantra T. Sinha on behalf of Jose Brito (aty to be noticed) (Sinha, Sumantra)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION #5 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 2/13/2019. (Marziliano, August)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Jose Brito. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipts of Filing Fees and Internal Server Error) (Huot, Innessa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11189290 (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Jose Brito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Consent to Sue) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brito v. Marina's Bakery Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Gonzalez
Represented By: Hugh G. Jasne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarito Gonzalez
Represented By: Hugh G. Jasne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina's Bakery Corp.
Represented By: Hugh G. Jasne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Brito
Represented By: Jeffrey Olshansky
Represented By: Farrell Austin Brody
Represented By: Innessa Melamed Huot
Represented By: Alex J. Hartzband
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Collopy
Represented By: Sumantra T. Sinha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?