Canales v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Esther Canales
Defendant: NYU Lutheran Hospital, Dr. Jacqueline F. Ford, Dr. Kayla Cagle-Colon, United States of America and NYU Langone Hospital Brooklyn
Case Number: 1:2019cv00834
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NYU Lutheran Hospital (Stupak, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esther Canales. United States of America served on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Rosenberg, Lewis)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE to Take Deposition by Kayla Cagle-Colon, Jacqueline F. Ford, NYU Lutheran Hospital. (Stupak, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esther Canales. NYU Lutheran Hospital served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Rosenberg, Lewis)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esther Canales. Jacqueline F. Ford served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Rosenberg, Lewis)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esther Canales. Kayla Cagle-Colon served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Rosenberg, Lewis)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Wayne Stupak on behalf of Kayla Cagle-Colon, Jacqueline F. Ford, NYU Lutheran Hospital (aty to be noticed) (Stupak, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jacqueline F. Ford. (Radomisli, Gregory)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kayla Cagle-Colon. (Radomisli, Gregory)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by NYU Lutheran Hospital. (Radomisli, Gregory)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kayla Cagle-Colon, Jacqueline F. Ford, NYU Lutheran Hospital. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Esther Canales (Rosenberg, Lewis)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Esther Canales(as Mother and Natural Guardian of Infant, E.O.M. ), Esther Canales (Rosenberg, Lewis)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11190072 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Esther Canales(as Mother and Natural Guardian of Infant, E.O.M. ), Esther Canales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rosenberg, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canales v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Lutheran Hospital
Represented By: Gregory John Radomisli
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Stupak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jacqueline F. Ford
Represented By: Gregory John Radomisli
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Stupak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kayla Cagle-Colon
Represented By: Gregory John Radomisli
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Stupak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYU Langone Hospital Brooklyn
Represented By: Gregory John Radomisli
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Stupak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Esther Canales
Represented By: Lewis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?