Scarso v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Dena Scarso
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00866
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Allyne R Ross
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 CASE: 1:19-cv-00866 DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Eastern District of Michigan as case 2:19-cv-10609, filed 03/04/2019. (Marziliano, August)
March 1, 2019 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Michigan. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-17 - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Michigan for the reasons stated in the order of October 5, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable David M. Lawson. (Marziliano, August)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-17 - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Michigan for the reasons stated in the order of October 5, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable David M. Lawson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. (Marziliano, August)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11197483 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Dena Scarso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Zweig, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarso v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena Scarso
Represented By: Jason A. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?