Kenny v. Madison Allied, LLC
Plaintiff: Walter Kenny
Defendant: Madison Allied, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00868
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Hong, Loan)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) (ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with each party to bear his or its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is hereby directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/25/2019) C/M (Galeano, Sonia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, parties to bear their own costs and fees by Walter Kenny (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court held a telephone conference in plaintiff's copyright infringement action on June 11, 2019. The parties shall complete all discovery by September 13, 2019. Upon completion of discovery, any party seeking to file a dispositive motion shall file a pre-motion conference request by September 27, 2019 in accordance with Judge Vitaliano's Individual Motion Practices and Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/11/2019. (Burks, Jory)
June 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Telephone Conference held on 6/11/2019. (FTR Log #3:45-4:00.) (Burks, Jory)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 Letter Joint Letter re: Status Update by Walter Kenny (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant, with plaintiff's consent, requests an adjournment of the June 3, 2019 telephone conference. The request is granted. The Court adjourns the telephone conference until June 11, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange and initiate the conference call. After establishing contact with defendant's counsel, plaintiff's counsel shall contact the Court at (718) 613-2170. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/14/2019. (Burks, Jory)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Madison Allied, LLC. (Quinn, James)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court held an initial conference in plaintiff's copyright infringement action on April 30, 2019. The parties shall exchange documents as discussed on the record. The parties shall file a joint status letter by May 30, 2019 regarding the status of the case. The Court shall hold a telephone conference on June 3, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange and initiate the conference call. After establishing contact with defendant, plaintiff's counsel shall contact the Court at (718) 613-2170. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/30/2019. (Burks, Jory)
April 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/30/2019. (FTR Log #3:19-3:36.) (Burks, Jory)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of Walter Kenny (aty to be noticed) (Freeman, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Quinn, James)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Madison Allied by Madison Allied, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26(a) Disclosure) (Quinn, James)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Discovery Request by Madison Allied, LLC. (Quinn, James)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Madison Allied, LLC. (Quinn, James)
March 15, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Initial Conference set for April 30, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. (Burks, Jory)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant's counsel writes to request an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint nunc pro tunc. ECF No. #7 . This is defendant's first request. Defendant states that he has contacted plaintiff's counsel, but as of the filing of this letter, plaintiff's counsel has not responded. As the first request for an extension of time is generally granted as a courtesy, defendant's request is granted. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by March 26, 2019. The Court shall hold an initial conference April 30, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by April 23, 2019. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/15/2019. (Burks, Jory)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of law firm name QUINN LAW PLLC (Quinn, James)
March 14, 2019 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Fernandez, Erica)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Madison Allied, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Postmarked Envelope w-Pleadings, #2 USPS Tracking for Certified Mail) (Quinn, James)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Quinn on behalf of Madison Allied, LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Quinn, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Madison Allied, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madison Allied, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11197632 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Walter Kenny. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenny v. Madison Allied, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Allied, LLC
Represented By: James F. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Kenny
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: James H. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?