Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund et al v. G-Net Construction Corp.

Plaintiff: Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Scholarship Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers Training and Apprenticeship Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Annuity Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund, Margaret Bowen, in her fiduciary capacity as Funds Administrator, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Pension Fund and Cement and Concrete Workers District Council
Defendant: G-Net Construction Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00876
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant G-Net Construction Corp. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant G-Net Construction Corp. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #9 Request for Certificate of Default, by Cement and Concrete Workers District Council, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Annuity Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Pension Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Scholarship Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers Training and Apprenticeship Fund, Margaret Bowen, in her fiduciary capacity as Funds Administrator (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Certificate of Default) (Mele, Joy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Certificate of Default by Cement and Concrete Workers District Council, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Annuity Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Pension Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Scholarship Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers Training and Apprenticeship Fund, Margaret Bowen, in her fiduciary capacity as Funds Administrator (Mele, Joy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Bowen, in her fiduciary capacity as Funds Administrator, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Scholarship Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Annuity Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Pension Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers Training and Apprenticeship Fund. G-Net Construction Corp. served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Mele, Joy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Sobel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Sobel, Jonathan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to G-Net Construction Corp.. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Cement and Concrete Workers District Council, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Annuity Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Pension Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Scholarship Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers Training and Apprenticeship Fund, Margaret Bowen, in her fiduciary capacity as Funds Administrator (Mele, Joy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Margaret Bowen, in her fiduciary capacity as Funds Administrator, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Scholarship Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Annuity Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Pension Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers Training and Apprenticeship Fund. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE :The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to file a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions ***INCLUDING THE CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY section on the second page***. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G-Net Construction Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11198829 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Margaret Bowen, in her fiduciary capacity as Funds Administrator, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Scholarship Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Annuity Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Pension Fund, Cement and Concrete Workers Training and Apprenticeship Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mele, Joy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2019: #2 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund et al v. G-Net Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Joy K. Mele
Represented By: Jonathan Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement and Concrete Workers Training and Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Joy K. Mele
Represented By: Jonathan Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Annuity Fund
Represented By: Joy K. Mele
Represented By: Jonathan Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Welfare Fund
Represented By: Joy K. Mele
Represented By: Jonathan Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Bowen, in her fiduciary capacity as Funds Administrator
Represented By: Joy K. Mele
Represented By: Jonathan Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement and Concrete Workers District Council Pension Fund
Represented By: Joy K. Mele
Represented By: Jonathan Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement and Concrete Workers District Council
Represented By: Joy K. Mele
Represented By: Jonathan Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G-Net Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?