Blair v. National Service Bureau, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Blair
Defendant: National Service Bureau, Inc, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00894
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Service Bureau, Inc (Marshall, Adam)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by National Service Bureau, Inc. (Marshall, Adam)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee .Application denied without prejudice, as the motion does not comply with Local Civil Rule 1.3(c)(the certificate of good standing is stale). Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/12/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11377401. by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Erik J. Jones, #2 Proposed Order) (Jones, Erik)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 4/18/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/21/2019. (Cardenas, Alex)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting, on consent, #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to defendant National Service Bureau, Inc. Defendant National Service Bureau, Inc.'s answer is due 4/12/2019. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 3/19/2019. (Lanci, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Elizabeth Blair. (Lemberg, Sergei)
March 15, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, on consent, #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 4/12/2019. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/15/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Blair. National Service Bureau, Inc served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Blair. Trans Union, LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth Blair. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, National Service Bureau, Inc, Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Elizabeth Blair (Lemberg, Sergei)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE :The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without an updated and completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to utilize the Civil Cover Sheet on our website and forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions ***INCLUDING THE CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY section on the second page*** as well as Question #2 (C) on the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, National Service Bureau, Inc, Trans Union, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11200754 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Elizabeth Blair. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. National Service Bureau, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Service Bureau, Inc
Represented By: Adam Matthew Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Represented By: Erik J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Blair
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?