Yu v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: Na Yu
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen, Gregory A. Richardson, Mike Pompeo and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv00897
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nina Gershon
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Greene on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Greene, Sean)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Na Yu. L. Francis Cissna served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019; Kirstjen Nielsen served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019; Mike Pompeo served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019; Gregory A. Richardson served on 2/15/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Zheng, Taobo)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nina Gershon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT NA YU against L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, Gregory A. Richardson filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11201300 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Na Yu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Zheng, Taobo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yu v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Sean P. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A. Richardson
Represented By: Sean P. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Sean P. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Sean P. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Na Yu
Represented By: Taobo Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?