Suris v. Investor's Business Daily, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Defendant: Investor's Business Daily, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00908
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Saul Perloff Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11377854. by Investor's Business Daily, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Perloff, Saul)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:30 A.M. on 6/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 6/7/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/8/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
April 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to answer #6 is granted. Defendant Investor's Business Daily, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 4/23/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/7/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Investor's Business Daily, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stokes, Peter)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion of Peter Stokes to to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/5/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Stokes Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11353947. by Investor's Business Daily, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Stokes, Peter)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Investor's Business Daily, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Investor's Business Daily, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11202039 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Segal, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suris v. Investor's Business Daily, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Represented By: Mitchell Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investor's Business Daily, Inc.
Represented By: Saul Perloff
Represented By: Peter A. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?