Sallie Mae, Inc. et al v. Homaidan

Appellee: Hilal K. Homaidan
Appellant: Navient Credit Finance Corporation, Sallie Mae, Inc. and Navient Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00935
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal --Motion of Defendants (A) to Certify Bankruptcy Court Order for Direct Appeal or, in the Alternative, (B) for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order and (C) to Stay Briefing Schedule-- Bankruptcy Court case number 17-, #4 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appeal --Motion of Defendants (A) to Certify Bankruptcy Court Order for Direct Appeal or, in the Alternative, (B) for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order and (C) to Stay Briefing Schedule-- Bankruptcy Court case n filed by Navient Credit Finance Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC, Sallie Mae, Inc.. (Fox, Shawn)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: The briefing schedule #2 as to appeal briefs is stayed until the Court decides Appellant's pending motions #4 and #5 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 4/12/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Newton Freiberg on behalf of Hilal K. Homaidan (aty to be noticed) (Freiberg, Peter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal --Motion of Defendants (A) to Certify Bankruptcy Court Order for Direct Appeal or, in the Alternative, (B) for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order and (C) to Stay Briefing Schedule-- Bankruptcy Court case number 17-, #4 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appeal --Motion of Defendants (A) to Certify Bankruptcy Court Order for Direct Appeal or, in the Alternative, (B) for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order and (C) to Stay Briefing Schedule-- Bankruptcy Court case n filed by Hilal K. Homaidan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Freiberg, Peter)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Reese Shaw on behalf of Hilal K. Homaidan (aty to be noticed) (Shaw, Adam)
March 25, 2019 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Defendants. THIS IS NOT A FORMAL MOTION, BUT RATHER A MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS #4 & #5 WHICH ARE STILL PENDING. (Innelli, Michael)
March 24, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Regarding Certification Motion by Navient Credit Finance Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC, Sallie Mae, Inc. (Fox, Shawn)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appeal --Motion of Defendants (A) to Certify Bankruptcy Court Order for Direct Appeal or, in the Alternative, (B) for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order and (C) to Stay Briefing Schedule-- Bankruptcy Court case number 17-1085-ess. by Navient Credit Finance Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC, Sallie Mae, Inc.. (Fox, Shawn)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appeal --Motion of Defendants (A) to Certify Bankruptcy Court Order for Direct Appeal or, in the Alternative, (B) for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order and (C) to Stay Briefing Schedule-- Bankruptcy Court case number 17-1085-ess. by Navient Credit Finance Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC, Sallie Mae, Inc.. (Fox, Shawn)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal --Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Defendants (A) to Certify Bankruptcy Court Order for Direct Appeal or, in the Alternative, (B) for Leave to Appeal Interlocutory Order, and (C) to Stay Briefing Schedule-- Bankruptcy Court case number 17-1085-ess. by Navient Credit Finance Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC, Sallie Mae, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Fox, Shawn)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Bankruptcy Record Received. Notice to all parties, in accordance with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), that the record has been received or is available electronically. Parties shall now follow briefing schedule as set forth in Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018. Specifically, appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days of this notice, the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellants brief, and the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellees brief, but a reply brief must be filed at least 7 days before scheduled argument. (Attachments: #1 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (AP, #2 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (AP: Notice Recipients) (Brown, Marc)
February 15, 2019 Notice that appeal from the Bankruptcy Court has been docketed. Parties shall file with the Bankruptcy Clerk their designations of items to be included in the record and statement of issues to be presented pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1-17-01085., filed by Navient Solutions, LLC, Sallie Mae, Inc., Navient Credit Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 #109 BK Documents, #2 #109-1 Transmittal, #3 #109-2 Notice of Recipients, #4 Civil Cover Sheet #106) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sallie Mae, Inc. et al v. Homaidan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hilal K. Homaidan
Represented By: Lynn E. Swanson
Represented By: Austin Smith
Represented By: Kathryn Johnson
Represented By: George F. Carpinello
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Robert Tietjen
Represented By: Adam Reese Shaw
Represented By: Peter Newton Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Navient Credit Finance Corporation
Represented By: Shawn R. Fox
Represented By: K. Elizabeth Sieg
Represented By: Dion W. Hayes
Represented By: Thomas M. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sallie Mae, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn R. Fox
Represented By: K. Elizabeth Sieg
Represented By: Dion W. Hayes
Represented By: Thomas M. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Navient Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Shawn R. Fox
Represented By: K. Elizabeth Sieg
Represented By: Dion W. Hayes
Represented By: Thomas M. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?