R.H. et al v. NYC Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: E.M.E. and R.H.
Defendant: NYC Department of Education, NYC Board of Education and Chancellor Richard Carranza
Case Number: 1:2019cv00966
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nina Gershon
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 5/20/2019. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 5/7/2019 has been rescheduled to 6/11/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties are to refer to #7 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 6/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/17/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until May 21, 2019 by Chancellor Richard Carranza, NYC Board of Education, NYC Department of Education. (Edmonds, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 4/19/2019. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 5/7/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 5/2/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/20/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until April 19, 2019 by Chancellor Richard Carranza, NYC Board of Education, NYC Department of Education. (Edmonds, Elizabeth)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, #3 Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening by E.M.E., R.H. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Hyman, Elisa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nina Gershon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chancellor Richard Carranza, NYC Board of Education, NYC Department of Education filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11208438 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by R.H.(on behalf of himself), E.M.E.(on behalf of her minor child, Y.H.), E.M.E.(on behalf of herself), R.H.(on behalf of his minor child, Y.H.). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment 1, #2 Proposed Summons Attachment 2, #3 Proposed Summons Attachment 3, #4 Proposed Summons Attachment 4) (Hyman, Elisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.H. et al v. NYC Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.M.E.
Represented By: Elisa F. Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.H.
Represented By: Elisa F. Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Department of Education
Represented By: Elizabeth Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Board of Education
Represented By: Elizabeth Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor Richard Carranza
Represented By: Elizabeth Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?