Romeo v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Romeo
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01054
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Fuchs, Stephen)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant Smith & Nephew, Inc., to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to April 19, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/28/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Taiwo, Jennifer)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith & Nephew, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Smith & Nephew p.l.c. for Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Fuchs, Stephen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Fuchs on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fuchs, Stephen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Taiwo on behalf of Smith & Nephew, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Taiwo, Jennifer)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11221915 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Michael Romeo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kirschenbaum, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romeo v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen A. Fuchs
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Taiwo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Romeo
Represented By: Gregory W. Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?