Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Leomax Supplies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Leomax Supplies, Inc., John Doe Companies "1" through "3", John Does "1" through "3" and Yevsey Tseytelman
Case Number: 1:2019cv01236
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Leomax Supplies, Inc., Yevsey Tseytelman. (Furman, Mark)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 ICQuestionnaire/Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Leomax Supplies, Inc. answer due 4/26/2019; Yevsey Tseytelman answer due 4/26/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/28/2019. (Marino, Janine)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Leomax Supplies, Inc., Yevsey Tseytelman. (Furman, Mark)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Furman on behalf of Leomax Supplies, Inc., Yevsey Tseytelman (aty to be noticed) (Furman, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Yevsey Tseytelman served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Calabrese, Justin)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Leomax Supplies, Inc. served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Calabrese, Justin)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin A. Calabrese on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Calabrese, Justin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe Companies "1" through "3", John Does "1" through "3", Leomax Supplies, Inc., Yevsey Tseytelman filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11247283 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, Geico Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11) (Levy, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Leomax Supplies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leomax Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Mark L. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Companies "1" through "3"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does "1" through "3"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yevsey Tseytelman
Represented By: Mark L. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Justin A. Calabrese
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Justin A. Calabrese
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Justin A. Calabrese
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Justin A. Calabrese
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?