Washington v. The Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare et al
Plaintiff: Korianna Washington
Defendant: The New York City Department of Education, Candace Hugee, Jeffrey Quarles and The Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare
Case Number: 1:2019cv01277
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Peggy Kuo
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Korianna Washington. Jeffrey Quarles served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019. (Wabnik, Debra)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Initial Conference scheduled for May 30, 2019 is rescheduled for June 11, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The parties must submit a completed copy of the #15 Proposed Discovery Plan by June 4, 2019. (See April 8, 2019 Order.)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/16/2019. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Rossana)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on May 30, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/8/2019. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Rossana)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendants New York City Department of Education and the Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 28, 2019. Because the extension granted is for a substantial period of time, further extensions of time to answer will not be granted absent unforeseen and compelling circumstances. An Initial Conference is scheduled for May 30, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/8/2019. (Gonzalez-Munoz, Rossana)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by The New York City Department of Education, The Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare. (Yogiaveetil, Rosemary)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemary Yogiaveetil on behalf of The New York City Department of Education, The Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare (aty to be noticed) (Yogiaveetil, Rosemary)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Korianna Washington. The New York City Department of Education served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Wabnik, Debra)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Korianna Washington. Candace Hugee served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. (Wabnik, Debra)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Korianna Washington. The Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. (Wabnik, Debra)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Korianna Washington (Wabnik, Debra)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Korianna Washington (Wabnik, Debra)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Korianna Washington (Wabnik, Debra)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Korianna Washington (Wabnik, Debra)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Korianna Washington (Wabnik, Debra)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Candace Hugee, Jeffrey Quarles, The New York City Department of Education, The Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11256567 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Korianna Washington. (Wabnik, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. The Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Rosemary Yogiaveetil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Hugee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Quarles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Urban Assembly School for Collaborative Healthcare
Represented By: Rosemary Yogiaveetil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korianna Washington
Represented By: Debra L. Wabnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?