Yesh Music, LLC v. MySpace LLC

Plaintiff: Richard Cupolo, Yesh Music, LLC and Bryan Eich
Defendant: MySpace LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02673
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Raymond J Dearie
Referring Judge: Steven M Gold
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC by MySpace LLC. (McSwiggin, Laura)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E McSwiggin on behalf of MySpace LLC (notification declined or already on case) (McSwiggin, Laura)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Richard Dowdall on behalf of MySpace LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Dowdall, Tyler)
July 3, 2019 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Myspace LLC Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11630900. $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11633682 (Dowdall, Tyler)
July 3, 2019 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Myspace LLC Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11630908. $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11633608 (McSwiggin, Laura)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Laura E. Merriman shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/3/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tyler Richard Dowdall shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/3/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Myspace LLC Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11630908. by MySpace LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit w/ Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (McSwiggin, Laura)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Myspace LLC Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11630900. by MySpace LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit w/ Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Dowdall, Tyler)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MySpace LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Bryan Eich, Richard Cupolo (Garbarini, Richard)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Yesh Music, LLC (Garbarini, Richard)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MySpace LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11453586 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Yesh Music, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration, #2 Exhibit Registration, #3 Exhibit Registration, #4 Exhibit Assignment) (Garbarini, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yesh Music, LLC v. MySpace LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cupolo
Represented By: Richard M. Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesh Music, LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Eich
Represented By: Richard M. Garbarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace LLC
Represented By: Laura E McSwiggin
Represented By: Tyler Richard Dowdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?