Martinez v. Kiska Construction, Inc.

Plaintiff: Martinez Jordan Victor and Victor Jordan Martinez
Defendant: Kiska Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02691
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Scheduling Order Consented to by the Parties by Victor Jordan Martinez (Gewirtz, Jeff)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/17/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 7/11/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/5/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Kiska Construction, Inc.. (Stern, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Gewirtz on behalf of Victor Jordan Martinez (aty to be noticed) (Gewirtz, Jeff)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/29/2019. (Shanies, Rachel)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11520041. by Victor Jordan Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Gewirtz, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing GA Supreme Court, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing NDGA, #4 Proposed Order) (Haigney, Dayton)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kiska Construction, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Martinez Jordan Victor (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Haigney, Dayton)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martinez Jordan Victor filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11457251 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Martinez Jordan Victor. (Haigney, Dayton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Kiska Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinez Jordan Victor
Represented By: Dayton P Haigney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Jordan Martinez
Represented By: Dayton P Haigney
Represented By: Jeff Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiska Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Evan Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?